CA AB2556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17510.85 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 12599.6 of, and to add Section 12599.9 to, the Government Code, relating to charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable organizations: crowdfunding solicitors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17510.85Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12599.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12599.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback