CA AB2554 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 68120 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: exemption from mandatory systemwide tuition and fees: surviving child or spouse of a federal firefighter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2554 Bonta By Pan (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2554 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-24 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5230.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4900.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code68120Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69436.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback