CA AB255 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 24 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8670.8.3 of the Government Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal resources: oil spills: grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 255 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2019-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8670.8.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback