CA AB255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6608.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to sexually violent predators.
Title
Sexually violent predators: out-of-county placement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB255 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 255 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 255 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6608.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |