CA AB2549 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2301 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 2074.2, 2074.6, 2074.8, and 2075.5 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Sections 5002.2, 5009.1, 5010.6, and 5080.23 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2549 W., P.& W. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By LEVINE (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2549 W., P., & W.(Levine) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2549 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2549 W., P., & W.(Levine) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2549 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5814.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4877.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4871.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2074.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2074.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2074.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2075.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5002.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5003.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5009.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |