CA AB2543 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 47607.1 to the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter schools: renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2543 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2543 Bonnie Lowenthal By Price (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2543 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2543 Bonnie Lowenthal By Price (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2543 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6687.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4827.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5475.) | |
2010-05-28 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 19). | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |