CA AB2542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1473 and 1473.7 of, and to add Section 745 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2542 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2542 Kalra et al. By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2542 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 16.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-07-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2020-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1473Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1473.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code745New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback