CA AB253 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.87 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Assembly - AB 253 BIGELOW Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB253 Bigelow By Berryhill Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 253 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB253 Bigelow By Berryhill Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 253 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3208.). |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2712.). |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |