CA AB2528 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 71150 and 71153 of, and to add Section 71151 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Climate adaptation.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2528 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2528 Bloom et al. By Allen (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2528 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2528 Bloom et al. By Allen (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2528 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 6664.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5592.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5380.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71156 | New Code | See Bill Text |