CA AB2521 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 78050) of Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Rios Community College Pilot Program to Support

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-14AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12).
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback