CA AB2516 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17926.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing accessibility: Accessible Housing Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-27 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |