CA AB2513 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11591 and 11591.5 of, to repeal Sections 11590, 11592, 11593, and 11595 of, and to repeal and add Section 11594 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: narcotics registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11590 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11591.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11592 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11593 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11594 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11595 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |