CA AB2500 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 30. Page 5657.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 30. Page 5657.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22202, 22250, 22305, 22334, 22337, and 22452 of, and to add Sections 22304.5, 22334.5, and 22337.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.
Title
California Financing Law: consumer loans: charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2500 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 30 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 30. Page 5657.). |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22304.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22334 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22334.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |