CA AB250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17935, 17941, 17948, and 23153 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Minimum franchise tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17935 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB250 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB250 |