CA AB250 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33530, 33539, 60010, 60204, 60601, 60603, and 60604.5 of, to add Sections 60207 and 60208 to, and to repeal Section 60200.1 of, the Education Code, relating to instructional materials.
Title
Instructional materials: pupil assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 250 BROWNLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB250 Brownley By Lowenthal (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 250 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB250 Brownley By Lowenthal (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 250 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2904.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2194.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-22 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1728.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-10 | Measure version as amended on April 27 corrected. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2011-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |