CA AB25 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2750.5 of, to add Section 2750.7 to, and to repeal Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 2775) of Chapter 2 of Division 3 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker classification: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2750.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2775 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB25 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB25#99INT |