CA AB25 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49475 to the Education Code, relating to athletics.
Title
School districts: athletics: concussions and head
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 25 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB25 Hayashi By Strickland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 25 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB25 Hayashi By Strickland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 25 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2894.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2205.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1715.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2011-02-01 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-01-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 38131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 38134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49475 | New Code | See Bill Text |