CA AB2496 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2750.5 of the Labor Code, and to add Sections 621.6 and 13004.7 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Janitorial employees: employment status: burden of proof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2496 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2496 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2496 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2018-08-24 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5237.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 5253.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 13004.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 621.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2750.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |