CA AB2494 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.8 (commencing with Section 21570) to Division 21 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
County of Kern Citizens Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2494 Salas By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2494 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2494 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5230.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 4853.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 21570 | New Code | See Bill Text |