CA AB249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 82025, 84305, 84310, 84501, 84505, 84506.5, 84510, 84511, and 85704 of, to add Sections 84504.1, 84504.2, 84504.3, 84504.4, and 84504.5 to, to repeal Sections 84506, 84507, and 84508 of, and to repeal and add Sections 84502, 84503, 84504, and 84509 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 249 MULLIN Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB249 Mullin et al. By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - AB 249 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB249 Mullin et al. By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - AB 249 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3459.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 14). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3273.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2697.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1188.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |