CA AB249 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7031 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-10 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-08-23 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-08-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-03 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-03-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2011-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |