CA AB2488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.22 (commencing with Section 1798.90.4) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Personal information: precise geolocation data: data collection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.90.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |