CA AB2484 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2895 and 4548 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Vocational nurses: psychiatric technicians: fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2484&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2451-2500/ab_2484_bill_20100219_introduced.html |