CA AB248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25200 of, and to add Section 25200.25 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste: facilities: permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB248 Reyes et al. By Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 248 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2999.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1784.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1706.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26).
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2017-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25200Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25200.25New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback