CA AB2479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66027.9 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: income share agreement: pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2479 VOEPEL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66027.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback