CA AB2473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6254.32 to the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public investment funds.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2473 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 4695.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6254.32 | New Code | See Bill Text |