CA AB2470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5260 and 7271 of, and to add Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 7700) to Division 4 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to invasive species.
Title
Invasive Species Council of California.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2470 GRAYSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2470 Grayson et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2470 GRAYSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2470 Grayson et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2470 GRAYSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.) |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5992.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and AGRI. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5555.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 7271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 7700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 72000 | New Code | See Bill Text |