CA AB2462 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 1966.20) of Chapter 8 of Division 2.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to neighborhood electric vehicles.
Title
Neighborhood electric vehicles: County of Los Angeles: Westside Planned Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2462 Valladares Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4581.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 1966.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |