CA AB2460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23356.4 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licenses: art galleries.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23356.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2460 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2460 |