CA AB246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21180, 21181, 21183, 21185, 21186, 21189.1, and 21189.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: Jobs and Economic Improvement Through Environmental Leadership Act of 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 246 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-16 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB246 Santiago et al. By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 246 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-16 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB246 Santiago et al. By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 246 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 6. Page 3536.). |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3535.) |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 16). |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3533.) |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3001.). |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2582.) |
2017-09-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 1946.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 7). |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25158.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |