CA AB2459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 100504.1 to the Government Code, and to add and repeal Section 17052.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: credits: health insurance premiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2459 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2459 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5486.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100504.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |