CA AB2453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 6 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17074.25 of the Education Code, and to add Section 44391.3 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air pollution: schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2453 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and EQ.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5472.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-09Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.)
2018-04-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4554.)
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17074.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44391.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback