CA AB2449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1007, 1009, 5017, and 72027 of the Education Code, relating to school and college elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts, county offices of education, and community college districts: governing boards: elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2449 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2449 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5005.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code1007Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code1009Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code5017Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code72027Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback