CA AB2446 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.33 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: diapers.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] |
Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |