CA AB2441 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.1 (commencing with Section 3125) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: local public transit agencies: autonomous transit vehicle technology.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2441 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Kalra By Gonzalez (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2441 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Kalra By Gonzalez (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2441 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5074.). |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4366.) |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 30). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3125 | New Code | See Bill Text |