CA AB2440 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 42457) to Chapter 8.4 of, Article 7 (commencing with Section 42499.5) to Chapter 8.6 of, and Chapter 7.5 (commencing with Section 42420) to, and to repeal Chapter 8.4 (commencing with Section 42451) and Chapter 8.6 (commencing with Section 42490) of, Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Responsible Battery Recycling Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2440 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2440 Irwin et al. By Newman (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2440 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2440 Irwin et al. By Newman (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2440 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 10.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on August 25 corrected. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5212.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 7. Page 4850.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42420 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42451 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42457 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42490 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42499.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |