CA AB244 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22856 to the Government Code, to add Section 1374.74 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10144.8 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 244 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB244 Beall By Ashburn (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 244 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB244 Beall By Ashburn (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 244 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 3218.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2165.) | |
2009-09-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 17). | |
2009-07-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 15). | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1834.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22856 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |