CA AB2439 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 429.4 to the Government Code, relating to state memorials.
Title
Official state LGBTQ Veterans Memorial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2439 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2439 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2439 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2439 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2439 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 172, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 6143.). |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5109.). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4889.) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 429.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |