CA AB2435 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 57400 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government organization: disincorporated cities.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died at Desk. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 57400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2435&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2401-2450/ab_2435_bill_20160219_introduced.html |