CA AB243 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 64691.7 of, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 65001) to Part 2 of Division 22 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Beef Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 243 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 243 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 3. Page 1536.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 64591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 64691.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 65001 | New Code | See Bill Text |