CA AB243 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 19331), Article 13 (commencing with Section 19350), and Article 17 (commencing with Section 19360) to Chapter 3.5 of Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 12029 to the Fish and Game Code, to add Sections 11362.769 and 11362.777 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 13276 to the Water Code, relating to medical marijuana, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 243 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 3)AB 243 Wo od By (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 243 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 3)AB 243 Wo od By (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 243 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 3207.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 2737.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2743.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2744.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2749.) Ord |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 1863.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.S. & T.M. |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19331 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19350 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19360 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2220.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 12029 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.769 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.777 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13276 | New Code | See Bill Text |