CA AB2427 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12100.151 of, and to add Section 65850.72 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 25231 of the Public Resources Code, relating to land use.
Title
Electric vehicle charging stations: permitting: curbside charging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65850.72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |