CA AB2427 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89708 of, and to add and repeal Section 89012 of, the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
California State University: special session fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2427 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2427 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-25 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5133.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 17). | |
2012-03-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 89708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |