CA AB2426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 679.10 and 679.11 of the Penal Code, relating to victims of crime.
Title
Victims of crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2426 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2426 Reyes By Caballero (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2426 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2426 Reyes By Caballero (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2426 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5427.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4679.) |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 679.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 679.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |