CA AB2425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 78080) of Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: Hire UP: From Corrections to Career Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2425 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4845.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 4844.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78080 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |