CA AB2425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 786.5, 827, and 828 of, and to add Section 827.95 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile police records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2425 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2425 Mark Stone By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2425 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2020-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback