CA AB2421 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 65850.75 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: permitting: wireless communications: emergency standby generators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2421 Quirk Assembly Third Reading By RIVAS, L (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
2020-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2020-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65850.75Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback