CA AB2413 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 71155 to the Public Resources Code, relating to climate adaptation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sea level rise preparation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71155New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback