CA AB2404 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 387, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 387, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 481 and 730 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2404 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2404 Hill By Calderon (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2404 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2404 Hill By Calderon (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2404 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 387, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6586.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4784.) | |
2010-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5236.) | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |