CA AB24 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 51470) to Chapter 3 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to instructional programs.
Title
Instructional programs: State Seal of Civic Engagement.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 24 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB24 Eggman et al. By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 24 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB24 Eggman et al. By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 24 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2911.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2307.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1260.) |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1187.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51470 | New Code | See Bill Text |